This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 11:05:44 (UTC).

TANA MACKE VS THOMAS MACKE

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 TANA MACKE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMAS MACKE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0244

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Macke, Tana

Respondent

Macke, Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LORENZ, JENNA M

LAW OFFICES OF JENNA LORENA

Respondent Attorney

NEWPORT FAMILY LAW & MEDIATION GROUP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 12/03/2018 Withdrawal Of Attorney; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 09/10/2018; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/10/2018; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/10/2018; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 09/10/2018; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/10/2018; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/24/2018 PRELIMINARY; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/10/2018 PRELIMINARY; Filing Party: MACKE, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/27/2018 Proof Of Service - Mail; Filing Party: MACKE, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/27/2018 FAMILY LAW NOTICE RE RELATED CASE; Filing Party: MACKE, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 02/27/2018 Response - Dissolution; Filing Party: MACKE, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 01/18/2018 Proof Of Service - Summons; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/09/2018 Notice - Related Case; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 01/09/2018 Petition - Dissolution; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • SUMMONS 01/09/2018 Summons; Filing Party: MACKE, TANA

    Read MoreRead Less