This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 06:10:35 (UTC).

TAHKEITA MOORE VS. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 TAHKEITA MOORE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tahkeita Moore

Defendant

Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Consumer Legal Services, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/17/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/17/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/17/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/17/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12943685 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12771580.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12943685 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12771580.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/14/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/14/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/14/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/14/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/14/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/14/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31063646 RECEIVED ON 09/17/2021 10:10:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41241677 RECEIVED ON 09/17/2021 10:00:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12943685 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12771580.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1894020 RECEIVED ON 09/14/2021 05:30:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 09/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MOORE, TAHKEITA ON 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant