This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:24:08 (UTC).

T. C. CHEN VS. WENDY L. HURTADO

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 T C CHEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WENDY L HURTADO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T. C. CHEN

Defendants

MARISOL ARELLANO

WENDY L. HURTADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDER AND MELLO, APC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 02/03/2015

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 02/03/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 01/29/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 01/29/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/28/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/13/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/13/2013

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/13/2013

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/13/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 09/30/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 09/30/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/28/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/28/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11442268 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11266200.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11442268 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11266200.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/28/13) RECEIVED ON 08/28/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/28/13) RECEIVED ON 08/28/2013.

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 01/29/2015

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 01/29/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4136918 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4136918 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/28/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/12/2013

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4133335 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4133335 REJECTED.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/29/2015.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/29/2015.

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2015
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 02/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 01/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 01/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 01/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4317617 RECEIVED ON 01/29/2015 12:20:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4136918 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4133335 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 09/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2273452 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348762 RECEIVED ON 08/13/2013 01:24:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CHEN, T. C. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1105474 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 11:54:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less