**********************-CJC
09/16/2022
Not Classified By Court
Contract - Other Contract
Orange, California
Synergy Systems Integration, LLC
Angeles Contractor, Inc.
Long Beach Community College District
Western Surety Company
Continental Casualty Company
Western National Mutual Insurance Company
Lanak & Hanna, P.C.
Feldman & Associates, Inc.
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991850.
ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC.; WESTERN SURETY COMPANY; CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY ON 01/06/2023
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023
CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022
PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/09/2022
AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/09/2022
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/09/2022
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/27/2022
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/27/2022
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/27/2022
NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/12/2022
COMPLAINT FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13109317 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12937330.
HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991850.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11085510 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023 03:15:06 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31253217 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023 03:06:36 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC.; WESTERN SURETY COMPANY; CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY ON 01/06/2023
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023
[-] Read LessDocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023
[-] Read LessDocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11069338 RECEIVED ON 11/28/2022 09:53:19 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41403670 RECEIVED ON 10/27/2022 03:24:08 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/12/2022
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31218499 RECEIVED ON 10/12/2022 12:08:25 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/28/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13109317 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12937330.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31208074 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2022 03:23:34 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 09/16/2022.
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022
[-] Read Less