This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 11:10:16 (UTC).

SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC VS. ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synergy Systems Integration, LLC

Others and Defendants

Angeles Contractor, Inc.

Long Beach Community College District

Western Surety Company

Continental Casualty Company

Cross Defendant

Western National Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lanak & Hanna, P.C.

Other and Defendant Attorney

Feldman & Associates, Inc.

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991850.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991850.

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC.; WESTERN SURETY COMPANY; CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY ON 01/06/2023

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC.; WESTERN SURETY COMPANY; CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY ON 01/06/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/09/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/09/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/09/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/09/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/09/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/09/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/27/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/12/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13109317 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12937330.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13109317 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12937330.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/28/2023

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991850.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11085510 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023 03:15:06 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31253217 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023 03:06:36 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC.; WESTERN SURETY COMPANY; CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY ON 01/06/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC. ON 01/06/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11069338 RECEIVED ON 11/28/2022 09:53:19 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 11/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
10/27/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41403670 RECEIVED ON 10/27/2022 03:24:08 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 10/12/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31218499 RECEIVED ON 10/12/2022 12:08:25 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/28/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13109317 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12937330.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31208074 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2022 03:23:34 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 09/16/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SYNERGY SYSTEMS INTEGRATION, LLC ON 09/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less