This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:31 (UTC).

SUZI WALDIE VS DEAN WALDIE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 SUZI WALDIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEAN WALDIE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PALAFOX, JULIE A.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1712

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

PALAFOX, JULIE A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

Respondent

WALDIE, DEAN DARWIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HAGAN, CARA J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • CONFERENCE - TRIAL SETTING (AUTO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 12/31/2018; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/31/2018; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 12/21/2018; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/21/2018; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 12/21/2018; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 12/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • CONFERENCE - TRIAL SETTING (AUTO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • NOTICE - CONTINUANCE 12/12/2018 Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • NOTICE - CONTINUANCE 12/12/2018 Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • MOTION - BIFURCATION 11/22/2016 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/10/2016; Filing Party: WALDIE, DEAN DARWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 05/10/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: WALDIE, DEAN DARWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/22/2016; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 03/22/2016; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 03/22/2016; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: WALDIE, SUZI AMBRIZ

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.