This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 06:48:49 (UTC).

SUSAN POJMANSKI VS. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 SUSAN POJMANSKI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Pojmanski

Defendants

Jeremy

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Downtown LA Law Group

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 06/25/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 06/25/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12880330 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12708089.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12880330 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12708089.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 04/27/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 04/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 04/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 04/27/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 04/27/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 04/27/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GEORGE; Department: C24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 06/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21034610 RECEIVED ON 06/25/2021 10:04:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12880330 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12708089.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31008569 RECEIVED ON 04/27/2021 10:58:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 04/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY POJMANSKI, SUSAN ON 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JEREMY, is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant