This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:18:59 (UTC).

SUSAN JACOBSEN VS STEPHEN JACOBSEN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SUSAN JACOBSEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEPHEN JACOBSEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8275

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JACOBSEN, SUSAN M

Respondent

JACOBSEN, STEPHEN M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SULLIVAN LAW & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • REQUEST - DISMISSAL - GRANTED - FULL CASE 10/16/2018; Filing Party: JACOBSEN, SUSAN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 09/25/2018; Filing Party: JACOBSEN, SUSAN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - DISMISSAL 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 01/22/2018 Notice - Other; Filing Party: JACOBSEN, SUSAN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 10/30/2017; Filing Party: JACOBSEN, SUSAN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: JACOBSEN, SUSAN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: JACOBSEN, SUSAN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: JACOBSEN, SUSAN M

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.