This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 04:06:20 (UTC).

SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. VS. UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

Superior Paving Company, Inc.

Others and Defendants

Uka's Big Saver Foods, Inc.

Solanki Properties, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Daily Aljian LLP

Other and Defendant Attorney

Maynard Cooper & Gale LLP

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.; SOLANKI PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/21/2022

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.; SOLANKI PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/21/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.; SOLANKI PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/21/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.; SOLANKI PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/21/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21112203 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21112203 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

STIPULATION AND ORDER

STIPULATION AND ORDER

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/18/2022 03:57:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/18/2022 03:57:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGAL CONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994633 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822546.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGAL CONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994633 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822546.

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.; SOLANKI PROPERTIES, LLC ON 12/20/2021

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.; SOLANKI PROPERTIES, LLC ON 12/20/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/22/2021 09:54:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/22/2021 09:54:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/05/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/05/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12967685 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12795608.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12967685 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12795608.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/05/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/05/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/05/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/05/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/04/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41260497 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41260497 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 11/04/2021

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31110482 RECEIVED ON 01/21/2022 09:48:13 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.; SOLANKI PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.; SOLANKI PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21112203 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/18/2022 03:57:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 03/22/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1867308 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2021 09:58:10 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12904753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12732572.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1863209 RECEIVED ON 06/24/2021 04:07:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 06/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY, INC. ON 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA UNITED PAVING CO. is a litigant