This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/21/2023 at 11:28:57 (UTC).

SUNWEST BANK VS. MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 SUNWEST BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunwest Bank

Defendants

GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, Inc.

Gary Langendoen

Oak Park Manor, LP

Ridgway Investments, Inc.

Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP

Luke V. McCarthy

GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, LP

Madison Realty Equities, LLC

GT Madison Realty, LLC

ADP TotalSource Inc.

Receiver

Stephen J. Donell

Guardian Ad Litem

BRADFORD P. MCCARTHY

Interested Parties

Yong Pak

Sun Young Pak

Sun Yong Pak

Ann Ford

Anne Ford

William Perry Ford

Quality Healthcare Asset Management LLC

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Buchalter, a Professional Corporation

Defendant Attorneys

Raines Feldman LLP

Law Offices of David M. Griffith

Arentfox Schiff LLP

Sergenian Law, P.C.

Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill LLP

Blakeley LC

Receiver Attorney

Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

Interested Party Attorneys

Gharibian Law, APC

Berman Litigation Group

Clausen Miller, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 12/11/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 12/11/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13190933 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13019059.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13190933 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13019059.

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 03/03/2023

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 03/03/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 03/03/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 03/03/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 03/03/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 03/03/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 160.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13175238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13003344.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 160.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13175238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13003344.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 02/06/2023

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 02/06/2023

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 02/06/2023

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 02/06/2023

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 02/06/2023

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 02/06/2023

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 02/06/2023

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 02/06/2023

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 01/19/2023

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 01/19/2023

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 01/05/2023

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 01/05/2023

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/04/2023

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/04/2023

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 12/12/2022 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 12/12/2022 08:30:00 AM.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/07/2022.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/07/2022.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY SUNWEST BANK REJECTED ON 11/30/2022.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY SUNWEST BANK REJECTED ON 11/30/2022.

519 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES SCHEDULED FOR 08/14/2023 AT 01:45:00 PM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13190933 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13019059.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21280564 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2023 10:29:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41456176 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2023 10:29:25 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41456175 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2023 10:29:08 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 160.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13175238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13003344.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
875 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1697660 RECEIVED ON 12/11/2019 11:55:19 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/15/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12666829 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12491528.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2863938 RECEIVED ON 11/25/2019 05:50:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 11/25/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less