This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 11:20:30 (UTC).

SUNWEST BANK VS. MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 SUNWEST BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunwest Bank

Defendants

GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, Inc.

Gary Langendoen

Oak Park Manor, LP

Ridgway Investments, Inc.

Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP

Luke V. McCarthy

GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, LP

Madison Realty Equities, LLC

GT Madison Realty, LLC

ADP TotalSource Inc.

Receiver

Stephen J. Donell

Guardian Ad Litem

BRADFORD P. MCCARTHY

Interested Parties

Yong Pak

Sun Young Pak

Sun Yong Pak

Ann Ford

Anne Ford

William Perry Ford

Quality Healthcare Asset Management LLC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Buchalter, a Professional Corporation

Defendant Attorneys

Law Offices of David M. Griffith

Raines Feldman LLP

Arentfox Schiff LLP

Sergenian Law, P.C.

Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill LLP

Blakeley LC

Receiver Attorney

Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

Interested Party Attorneys

Berman Litigation Group

Gharibian Law, APC

Other Attorneys

Clausen Miller, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 12/11/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 12/11/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13289377 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13117526.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13289377 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13117526.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 09/20/2023

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 09/20/2023

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/15/2023

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/15/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/23/2023.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/23/2023.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/23/2023.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/23/2023.

THIRD PARTY CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CHEN, HUIWEN ON 08/04/2023

THIRD PARTY CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CHEN, HUIWEN ON 08/04/2023

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11194975 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11194975 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21363849 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21363849 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 08/30/2023

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 08/30/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KAYE, KATHLEEN FOR 214 - CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13277857 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13106006.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KAYE, KATHLEEN FOR 214 - CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13277857 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13106006.

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: OWNERSHIP TO FUNDS IN DEPOSIT ACCOUNT) FILED BY CHEN, HUIWEN ON 08/24/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: OWNERSHIP TO FUNDS IN DEPOSIT ACCOUNT) FILED BY CHEN, HUIWEN ON 08/24/2023

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41531424 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41531424 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY SUNWEST BANK REJECTED ON 08/22/2023.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY SUNWEST BANK REJECTED ON 08/22/2023.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/21/2023.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/21/2023.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 08/21/2023

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 08/21/2023

575 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION HEARING; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13289377 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13117526.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31365252 RECEIVED ON 09/15/2023 06:01:43 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 09/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21356782 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2023 11:26:09 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11194975 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21363849 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
969 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1697660 RECEIVED ON 12/11/2019 11:55:19 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/15/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12666829 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12491528.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2863938 RECEIVED ON 11/25/2019 05:50:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 11/25/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SUNWEST BANK ON 11/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less