This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 12:51:18 (UTC).

SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC VS. UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO , LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC

Defendant

UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

Gaba Guerrini Law Corporation

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 06/18/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 06/18/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 05/15/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 05/15/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 01/28/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 01/28/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12464614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12288299.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12464614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12288299.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 12/05/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 12/05/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 12/05/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 12/05/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 12/05/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 12/05/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 06/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4981392 RECEIVED ON 06/18/2019 11:12:36 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 05/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2794714 RECEIVED ON 05/15/2019 05:54:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 01/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4930807 RECEIVED ON 01/28/2019 04:18:41 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12464614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12288299.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 12/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 12/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO., LLC ON 12/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1568029 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2018 01:02:08 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO. LLC is a litigant