This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:21:00 (UTC).

STUART MARKOVITZ VS SANDRA MARKOVITZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 STUART MARKOVITZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANDRA MARKOVITZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1700

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

Respondent

MARKOVITZ, SANDRA SUE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 09/12/2017; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/12/2017; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/12/2017; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/12/2017; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 09/08/2017; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 08/22/2017; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/11/2017; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/09/2017; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, SANDRA SUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 04/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 04/15/2016; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MARKOVITZ, STUART ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.