This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 08:30:49 (UTC).

STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST VS. SWAT KHAN

Case Summary

On 02/09/2016 STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SWAT KHAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST

STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST

Defendant

SWAT KHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY L. SPROUL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 02/09/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 02/09/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 02/09/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 02/09/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 02/09/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 02/09/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11919086 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11743283.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11919086 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11743283.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 3/2/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/2/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929200 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753418.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929200 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753418.

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 04/01/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 04/01/2016

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 04/01/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929200 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753418.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 3/2/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 03/01/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4511194 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016 03:46:56 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11919086 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11743283.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 02/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 02/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY STEVE LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST; DONNA LOVETT AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOVETT FAMILY TRUST ON 02/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2442423 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2016 02:51:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTORNEY AT LAW - GREGORY L. SPROUL