This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 05:38:19 (UTC).

STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST VS. VANESSA SAYERS

Case Summary

On 06/10/2016 STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VANESSA SAYERS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

TOM SAYERS

VANESSA SAYERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOKSEY, TOOLEN, GAGE, DUFFY & WOOG

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 02/03/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 02/03/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 01/18/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 01/18/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 01/18/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 01/18/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 10/07/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 10/07/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 09/21/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 09/21/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 9/8/2016) RECEIVED ON 09/07/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 9/8/2016) RECEIVED ON 09/07/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 07/27/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 07/27/2016 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 07/11/2016

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 07/11/2016

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 07/07/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 07/07/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 07/07/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 07/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/29/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/17/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/17/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SAYERS, VANESSA ON 06/17/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SAYERS, VANESSA ON 06/17/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982192 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11806277.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982192 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11806277.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/10/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/10/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/10/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/10/2016

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 02/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 02/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3506915 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2017 10:43:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4664142 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 01/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 01/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1364202 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2017 02:05:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2499687 RECEIVED ON 10/07/2016 09:57:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 09/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • SAYERS, VANESSA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 06/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SAYERS, VANESSA ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SAYERS, VANESSA ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982192 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11806277.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY STEVE ERNEST, TRUSTEE OF THE ERNEST FAMILY TRUST ON 06/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2469680 RECEIVED ON 06/10/2016 02:05:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less