This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:32:39 (UTC).

STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST VS. DON E. HUBBS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C HILL TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DON E HUBBS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST

STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C

Defendants

DON E. HUBBS

HEATHER LEA HUBBS

ROBERT HUBBS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER LAW GROUP, PLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/10/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/14/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/14/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233350 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057030.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233350 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057030.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/08/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/08/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 10/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 10/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/18/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/18/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/27/2017

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017.

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/08/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/08/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244783 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068524.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244783 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068524.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/10/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/27/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/27/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/09/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/09/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/10/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4785796 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017 01:54:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1434980 RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017 08:47:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1432008 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2017 03:08:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233350 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY STEPHEN HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE STEPHEN C. HILL TRUST ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775660 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 01:02:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.