This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 02:08:09 (UTC).

STEPHEN BELLINGHAM VS. WL HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 STEPHEN BELLINGHAM filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WL HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELENORE NIU

STEPHEN BELLINGHAM

MARK NIU

KURT MAIR

NATHALIE BINDSCHEDLER

CHERRYL SELBY

DAVID SELBY

JONG LEE

PAUL ROMAN

FAN WU

CHIK WONG

Defendant and Other

WL HOMES LLC

Cross Defendants

CAPITAL DRYWALL, INC.

LI METAL SYSTEMS

BUILDER SERVICES GROUP, INC.

ORANGE COAST MASONRY, INC.

THORNTON STEEL & IRON WORKS, INC.

JPS SURFACE SOLUTIONS, INC.

EURO CLASSIC TILE & STONE

Interested Party and Intervenor

ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELFER LAW GROUP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

LEE, HERNANDEZ, LANDRUM & GAROFALO

MARTUCCI & ASSCOCIATES

Lee, Hernandez, Landrum & Carlson, APC

BOORNAZIAN, JENSEN & GARTHE, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Cross Defendant Attorneys

SKEBBA, ISAAC & BISHOP & BUECHLER

Skebba, Isaac & Buechler

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

Interested Party and Intervenor Attorney

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

Other Attorneys

MOKRI VANIS & JONES

LAW OFFICES OF WAGNER & ISERT-KOTT

ORLAND LAW GROUP

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER

KULUVA ARMIJO & GARCIA

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT

BOORNAZIAN, JENSEN & GARTHE, A PROFESS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/03/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/03/2019

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY M.B.C. CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 10/17/2018

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY M.B.C. CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 10/17/2018

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY M.B.C. CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 09/19/2018

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY M.B.C. CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 09/19/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 09/05/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 09/05/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 09/10/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 09/10/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 09/07/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 09/07/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/07/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/07/2018

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 08/30/2018.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 08/30/2018.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/23/2018

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/23/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/15/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/15/2018

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 12/29/2017

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 12/29/2017

ORDER - OTHER (RE COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION) FILED BY ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/14/2017

ORDER - OTHER (RE COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION) FILED BY ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/14/2017

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE THROUGH CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/30/2017

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE THROUGH CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/30/2017

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY LI METAL SYSTEMS ON 08/25/2017

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY LI METAL SYSTEMS ON 08/25/2017

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/17/2017

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/17/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12191246 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014946.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12191246 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014946.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 07/21/2017

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 07/21/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12191240 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014940.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12191240 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014940.

283 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3790356 RECEIVED ON 05/10/2019 01:15:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12550250 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12374129.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4966390 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019 02:24:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3788490 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019 02:24:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
400 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • THE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2017 AT 09:30:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SELBY, CHERRYL; SELBY, DAVID; NIU, ELENORE; MAIR, KURT; NIU, MARK; BINDSCHEDLER, NATHALIE; BELLINGHAM, STEPHEN ON 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1384689 RECEIVED ON 05/12/2017 01:54:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER COLAW, THIERRY ON 04/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12146156 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11969970.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BELLINGHAM, STEPHEN; BINDSCHEDLER, NATHALIE; MAIR, KURT; NIU, MARK; NIU, ELENORE; SELBY, DAVID; SELBY, CHERRYL ON 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BELLINGHAM, STEPHEN; BINDSCHEDLER, NATHALIE; MAIR, KURT; NIU, MARK; NIU, ELENORE; SELBY, DAVID; SELBY, CHERRYL ON 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BELLINGHAM, STEPHEN; BINDSCHEDLER, NATHALIE; MAIR, KURT; NIU, MARK; NIU, ELENORE; SELBY, DAVID; SELBY, CHERRYL ON 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2549785 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2017 02:54:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE COAST MASONRY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EURO CLASSIC TILE & STONE is a litigant

Latest cases where THORNTON STEEL & IRON WORKS is a litigant

Latest cases where JPS SURFACE SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant