This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/27/2020 at 11:15:21 (UTC).

STEPHANIE ABRAHAMS VS LAWRENCE ABRAHAMS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 STEPHANIE ABRAHAMS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LAWRENCE ABRAHAMS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OSPINO, FRANK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1691

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

OSPINO, FRANK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ABRAHAMS, STEPHANIE R

Respondent

ABRAHAMS, LAWRENCE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

PHILLIPS WHISNANT GAZIN GORCZYCA & CURTIN, LLP

GILBERT, IRENE CASSON

LAW OFFICE IRENE CASSON GILBERT

Respondent Attorneys

HUGHES & HUGHES

GOMEZ, MELINDA

Other Attorneys

SHAFFER, PAMELA JOY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - OTHER; Department: C59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION & ORDER 05/09/2019; Filing Party: ABRAHAMS, STEPHANIE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketHEARING - MOTION - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - OTHER; Department: C59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketHEARING - MOTION - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - OTHER; Department: C59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketHEARING - MOTION - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketORDER - ATTEND PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 04/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/30/2016; Filing Party: ABRAHAMS, LAWRENCE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/30/2016; Filing Party: ABRAHAMS, LAWRENCE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/30/2016; Filing Party: ABRAHAMS, LAWRENCE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketRESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/30/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: ABRAHAMS, LAWRENCE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketRETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 03/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS 02/29/2016; Filing Party: ABRAHAMS, STEPHANIE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ABRAHAMS, STEPHANIE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ABRAHAMS, STEPHANIE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 NO SUMMONS ISSUED Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: ABRAHAMS, STEPHANIE R

    Read MoreRead Less