This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 06:55:27 (UTC).

STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 VS. TAI MIRAMONTES

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TAI MIRAMONTES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST

MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST

Defendant

TAI MIRAMONTES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID S. SCHONFELD, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 07/25/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 07/25/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12003739 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11827823.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12003739 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11827823.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 07/20/2016.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 07/20/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 07/20/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 07/20/2016

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/20/2016.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/20/2016.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4577522 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4577522 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 07/18/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 07/18/2016 09:00:00 AM.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/27/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/27/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/27/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MIRAMONTES, TAI ON 06/23/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MIRAMONTES, TAI ON 06/23/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/23/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/23/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11985250 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11809335.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11985250 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11809335.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/17/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/17/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/17/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/17/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/17/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/17/2016

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 07/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12003739 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11827823.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RECEIVED ON 07/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 07/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3436980 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2016 09:11:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 7/18/16 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MIRAMONTES, TAI ON 06/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • MIRAMONTES, TAI REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 06/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MIRAMONTES, TAI ON 06/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11985250 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11809335.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY STEFANO RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04; MARIA RIMICCI AS TRUSTEE OF THE RIMICCI FAMILY TRUST 9/20/04 ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2471302 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016 08:10:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less