This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 06:47:45 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS. MARIA TORRES

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA TORRES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Maria Torres

Maria Alejandra Galindo-Torres

Cross Defendant

Rainer Borchers

Other and Defendant

Maria Alejandra Galindo-Torres

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pillemer & Pillemer

Other and Defendant Attorney

Gilsleider McMahon, Molinelli & Phan

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 375.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12937289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12765197.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 375.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12937289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12765197.

ORDER ON REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021.

ORDER ON REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021.

REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY TORRES, MARIA ON 08/23/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY TORRES, MARIA ON 08/23/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/30/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/30/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910964 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738840.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910964 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738840.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/09/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/09/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/09/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/09/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/09/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/09/2021

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 375.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12937289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12765197.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1885331 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021 10:14:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO OPT OUT OF MANDATORY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALINDO-TORRES, MARIA ALEJANDRA ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY TORRES, MARIA ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21056389 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021 10:14:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1876672 RECEIVED ON 07/30/2021 11:58:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910964 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738840.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41214698 RECEIVED ON 07/09/2021 10:26:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant