This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:54 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON LEGAL, APC

Defendant Attorney

GATES, O'DOHERTY, GONTER & GUY, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 02/26/2016.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/06/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/06/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751491.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751491.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 03/17/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 03/17/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12085392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11909355.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12085392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11909355.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/20/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/20/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FCA US LLC ON 06/24/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FCA US LLC ON 06/24/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/30/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/30/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY BENSON, SUSAN FOR 210 - ($15) PORTION OF COURT REPORTER SERVICES LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12125049 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11948872.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY BENSON, SUSAN FOR 210 - ($15) PORTION OF COURT REPORTER SERVICES LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12125049 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11948872.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/04/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/06/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/06/2016 08:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FCA US LLC ON 06/28/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FCA US LLC ON 06/28/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MSC DATES) FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/04/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MSC DATES) FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/04/2017

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FCA US LLC ON 06/24/2016

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FCA US LLC ON 06/24/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 03/17/2017 11:39:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 03/17/2017 11:39:00 AM.

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LACOUR, MARCIA FOR 210 - ($15) PORTION OF COURT REPORTER SERVICES LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12125051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11948874.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LACOUR, MARCIA FOR 210 - ($15) PORTION OF COURT REPORTER SERVICES LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12125051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11948874.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4716477 RECEIVED ON 04/28/2017 03:36:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4706860 RECEIVED ON 04/11/2017 11:07:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LACOUR, MARCIA FOR 210 - ($15) PORTION OF COURT REPORTER SERVICES LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12125051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11948874.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY BENSON, SUSAN FOR 210 - ($15) PORTION OF COURT REPORTER SERVICES LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12125049 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11948872.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 03/17/2017 11:39:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 03/17/2017 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4542652 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2016 03:51:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4529216 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016 11:02:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751491.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306921 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:32:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.