This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/29/2022 at 03:47:25 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS. BROAN-NUTONE, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BROAN-NUTONE, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm General Insurance Company

Defendant

Broan-Nutone, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Watkins & Letofsky, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13021709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12849688.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13021709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12849688.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/01/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/01/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/22/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/22/2022

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY BROAN-NUTONE, LLC ON 05/05/2022

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY BROAN-NUTONE, LLC ON 05/05/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044801 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872817.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044801 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872817.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BROAN-NUTONE, LLC ON 05/05/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BROAN-NUTONE, LLC ON 05/05/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HUNT; Department: C23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31153026 RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022 08:28:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21155528 RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022 08:28:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BROAN-NUTONE, LLC ON 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044801 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872817.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY BROAN-NUTONE, LLC ON 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1970967 RECEIVED ON 04/01/2022 01:05:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41312599 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2022 11:51:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41310281 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2022 10:59:06 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13021709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12849688.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 03/16/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant