This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 07:42:30 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND VS. SALVADOR PEDRO DIAZ

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SALVADOR PEDRO DIAZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Defendants

Salvador Pedro Diaz Jr

SALVADOR PEDRO DIAZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathalie Tang

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION) FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 09/02/2021

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION) FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 09/02/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/10/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/10/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12935696 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12763604.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12935696 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12763604.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 08/26/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 08/26/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 08/26/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 08/26/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 08/26/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 08/26/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION) FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 09/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1889823 RECEIVED ON 09/02/2021 12:18:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/10/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12935696 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12763604.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31055567 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2021 03:01:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 08/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANG NATHALIE