This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 03:45:03 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND VS. 5 DIAMOND PROTECTION, INC

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 5 DIAMOND PROTECTION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendants

MOHAMMAD TARIQ SAYED

5 DIAMOND PROTECTION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 07/29/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 07/29/2019 08:30:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4990619 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4990619 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/03/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/03/2019 08:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 05/17/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 05/17/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 05/17/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 05/17/2019

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS OR CITATION FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 04/02/2019

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS OR CITATION FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 04/02/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 03/27/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 03/27/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12519035 AND REC

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12519035 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12342794.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS OR CITATION RECEIVED ON 02/01/2019.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS OR CITATION RECEIVED ON 02/01/2019.

APPLICATION - OTHER (DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS) FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 02/01/2019

APPLICATION - OTHER (DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS) FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 02/01/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER - OTHER (DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/07/2019

ORDER - OTHER (DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/07/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/01/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/01/2019

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 12/28/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 12/28/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12476138 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12299807.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12476138 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12299807.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 12/28/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 12/28/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 12/28/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 12/28/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 12/28/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 12/28/2018

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 07/29/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/23/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4990619 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/03/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • THE DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/29/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/29/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2795960 RECEIVED ON 05/17/2019 01:36:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3755185 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2019 09:53:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 12/28/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12476138 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12299807.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 12/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 12/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 12/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3743673 RECEIVED ON 12/28/2018 03:30:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5 DIAMOND PROTECTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant