This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 10:28:10 (UTC).

STACY ZANINOVICH-VEGA VS ANDRES VEGA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 STACY ZANINOVICH-VEGA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ANDRES VEGA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HENSON, CAROL L.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1158

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

HENSON, CAROL L.

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

VEGA, ANDRES L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingDescription: APPOINTMENT - MEDIATION; Department: FAMILY COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAPPOINTMENT - MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketORDER - ATTEND FAMILY MEDIATION - REMOTE 09/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 09/09/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 08/28/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/28/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 08/28/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/02/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketREFERRAL - FAMILY COURT SERVICES 07/02/2020 DVPSP ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: ZANINOVICH-VEGA, STACY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less