Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 04:35:09 (UTC).

STACY ROOKS VS KEITH ROOKS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 STACY ROOKS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KEITH ROOKS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8023

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROOKS, STACY

Respondent

ROOKS, KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JENNIFER OWENS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 12/17/2018 Rooks; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/31/2018; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/31/2018; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 07/31/2018; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/31/2018; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/10/2018 Income and Expense Declaration; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/10/2018 Request to enter default; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 11/28/2017; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/28/2017; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/14/2017 preliminary; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/29/2017; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 09/29/2017; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 09/29/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • SUMMONS 09/29/2017; Filing Party: ROOKS, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less