This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/11/2017 at 04:02:47 (UTC).

STACEY PALMER VS. ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2014 STACEY PALMER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STACEY PALMER

Defendants

JIM EDWARDS

ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.

CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASTEGAR LAW GROUP, APC

Defendant Attorney

GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 01/05/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 01/05/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/12/2015 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/12/2015 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/25/2015 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/25/2015 08:45:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11757847 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11582048.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11757847 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11582048.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.; CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 03/24/2015

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.; CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 03/24/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 03/24/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 03/24/2015

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.; CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 03/23/2015

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.; CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 03/23/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 01/30/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 01/30/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/06/2015 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/06/2015 08:45:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.; CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 01/05/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.; CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 01/05/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 12/31/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 12/31/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11710855 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11535138.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11710855 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11535138.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.; CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 12/22/2014

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.; CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 12/22/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 11/26/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 11/26/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 11/26/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 11/26/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2015 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2015 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 10/08/2014.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 10/08/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11673359 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11497502.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11673359 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11497502.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2016
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 01/05/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2433528 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2016 02:02:47 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/12/2015 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/14/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/11/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/25/2015 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 05/12/2015 AT 08:45 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/12/2015 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 11/26/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 11/26/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3220542 RECEIVED ON 11/26/2014 09:51:03 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2015 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 10/08/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11673359 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11497502.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 10/08/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 10/08/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PALMER, STACEY ON 10/08/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4259303 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2014 04:25:31 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cadence Aerospace LLC is a litigant