This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:22:33 (UTC).

STACEY COTTER VS KEVIN COTTER, JR.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 STACEY COTTER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KEVIN COTTER, JR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1694

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COTTER, STACEY LYNN

Respondents

COTTER, JR., KEVIN C.

COTTER, KEVIN C., JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN L. QUALLS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • ORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 09/18/2017; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/12/2017; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/12/2017; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 07/10/2017; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/10/2017; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/14/2017; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/13/2017 prelim; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/02/2017 5C SENT TO DUTY L73; Filing Party: COTTER, KEVIN C., JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/02/2017; Filing Party: COTTER, KEVIN C., JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/02/2017; Filing Party: COTTER, KEVIN C., JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/09/2016; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 03/09/2016; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: COTTER, STACEY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.