This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 16:12:25 (UTC).

ST. PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS. DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2017 ST PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA

ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

ST. PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT

FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.

DESERT COMMUNITIES CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

HILLTOP GEOTECHNICAL, INC.

MID VALLEY PAINTING, INC

PREFERRED FRAMING, INC

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTPAC AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

BRIAN MAURO CONSTRUCTION, INC

TOM WATSON, INC.

MERLE WILLIAMS & SONS CORP

BRENTWOOD SHEETMETAL, HEATING, AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

MAYER ROOFING, INC

EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Others

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

PULTE HOMES, INC.

DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.

EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

153 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

THE AGUILERA LAW GROUP, APLC

Defendant and Other Attorneys

PAYNE & FEARS

SELMAN BRIETMAN LLP

Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SELMAN BRIETMAN LLP

THE AGUILERA LAW GROUP, APLC

THE MORRISON LAW GROUP

BLAU KEANE LAW GROUP, P.C.

SKEBBA, ISAAC, BISHOP & BUECHLER

Other Attorneys

VILLARA CORPORATION

LAMBERT & ROGERS, APLC

WALSH MCKEAN FURCOLO LLP

SINNOTT, PUEBLA, CAMPAGNE & CURET, APLC

BARRETT & MATURA, P.C.

SIMS, LAWRENCE & ARRUTI

TARLE LAW, P.C.

HEROLD & SAGER

OLES MORRISON RINKER & BAKER LLP

JACOBSEN & MCELROY PC

MORALES FIERRO & REEVES

MORISON & PROUGH, LLP

TRESSLER LLP

SMITH ELLISON

19 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 02/07/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 02/07/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 02/06/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 02/06/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12494161 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12317860.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12494161 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12317860.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12481498 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12305188.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12481498 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12305188.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 01/02/2019.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 01/02/2019.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF SUBMITTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1) FILED BY AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE CO.; INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY CO. ON 11/05/2018

NOTICE - OTHER (OF SUBMITTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1) FILED BY AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE CO.; INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY CO. ON 11/05/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2018-09-07 15:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2018-09-07 15:00:00.0.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12393054 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12216755.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12393054 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12216755.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY IES RESIDENTIAL, INC. ON 05/09/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY IES RESIDENTIAL, INC. ON 05/09/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED ON 04/13/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED ON 04/13/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12321469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12145241.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12321469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12145241.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12320638 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12144399.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12320638 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12144399.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CLAREMONT LIABILITY INS. CO. ON 03/09/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CLAREMONT LIABILITY INS. CO. ON 03/09/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 02/27/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 02/27/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PETERSON-DEAN, INC. ON 02/15/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PETERSON-DEAN, INC. ON 02/15/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/03/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/03/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 12/07/2017

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 12/07/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12081241.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12081241.

413 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: CLASTER; Department: CX104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: REVIEW HEARING; Judge: CLASTER; Department: CX104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3968048 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2021 04:09:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 11/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORP.; PULTE HOME CORPORATION; PULTE HOMES, INC. ON 11/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2958834 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2020 11:55:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2957757 RECEIVED ON 11/12/2020 04:33:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
701 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2017-12-05 15:19:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/21/2018 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketTHE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/21/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 11/22/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12081241.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ST. PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY; TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA; FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.; ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT ON 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ST. PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY; TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA; FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.; ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT ON 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ST. PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY; TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA; FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.; ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT ON 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1443341 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2017 10:22:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRENTWOOD SHEET METAL HEATING & AIR CONDITI is a litigant

Latest cases where DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Mid Valley Painting, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PREFERRED FRAMING INC is a litigant