This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/06/2017 at 10:31:01 (UTC).

SPIZER VS. JLS CONCRETE PUMPING

Case Summary

On 01/21/2011 SPIZER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JLS CONCRETE PUMPING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID SPIZER

Defendant

JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC

Intervenor and Other

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARK J MEYERS

Defendant Attorney

YOKA & SMITH LLP

Intervenor and Other Attorney

BINAM, ROBERT M:LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE/COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION) FILED BY ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD. ON 04/09/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE/COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION) FILED BY ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD. ON 04/09/2013

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 02/05/2013

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 02/05/2013

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 02/04/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 02/04/2013 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 01/08/2013

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 01/08/2013

NOTICE OF RULING (REGARDING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC ON 08/08/2012

NOTICE OF RULING (REGARDING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC ON 08/08/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11198873 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11022765.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11198873 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11022765.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 08/06/2012

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 08/06/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11198844 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11022736.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11198844 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11022736.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC ON 08/03/2012

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC ON 08/03/2012

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/02/2012 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/02/2012 09:00:00 AM.

ORDER - OTHER (CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC ON 08/02/2012

ORDER - OTHER (CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC ON 08/02/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11196331 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11020223.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11196331 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11020223.

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC ON 08/01/2012

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC ON 08/01/2012

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD. ON 07/03/2012

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD. ON 07/03/2012

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE FILING COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION) FILED BY ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD. ON 07/03/2012

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE FILING COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION) FILED BY ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD. ON 07/03/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 167 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11169141 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10993033.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 167 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11169141 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10993033.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/15/2012.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/15/2012.

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE/COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION) FILED BY ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD. ON 04/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 183553 RECEIVED ON 04/09/2013 10:07:42 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 02/05/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2199129 RECEIVED ON 02/05/2013 02:21:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 02/04/2013 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/01/2011 09:49:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 03/01/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 36.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10842513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10666405.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (BANKRUPTCY STAY) FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING ON 02/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 02/02/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10818659 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10642551.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCEACHEN, DAVID ON 01/21/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 01/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 01/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SPIZER, DAVID ON 01/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JLS Concrete Pumping Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant