This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 09:43:28 (UTC).

SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC VS. DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spectrum Office Properties II LLC

Defendants

Drybar Holdings LLC

Drybar Products LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bewley Lassleben & Miller, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12996100 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12824019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12996100 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12824019.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC ON 01/18/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC ON 01/18/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/14/2022 10:17:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/14/2022 10:17:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC ON 01/07/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC ON 01/07/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 12/22/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 12/22/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12957222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12785119.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12957222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12785119.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC ON 10/12/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC ON 10/12/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 09/14/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 09/14/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER) FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC; DRYBAR PRODUCTS LLC ON 09/10/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER) FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC; DRYBAR PRODUCTS LLC ON 09/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/25/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12930697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12758584.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12930697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12758584.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/16/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/16/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/16/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/16/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/16/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/16/2021

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/14/2023 AT 11:30:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12996100 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12824019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21111412 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2022 12:22:02 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC ON 01/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/14/2022 10:17:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT W2.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41232961 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021 02:11:22 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21057646 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021 02:03:08 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12930697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12758584.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1882603 RECEIVED ON 08/16/2021 07:53:57 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 08/16/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SPECTRUM OFFICE PROPERTIES II LLC ON 08/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less