This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/28/2022 at 04:36:39 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS. CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern California Edison Company

Defendants

California State Board of Equalization

Fresno County

Imperial County

Inyo County

Kern County

Kings County

Los Angeles County

Madera County

Modoc County

Mono County

Orange County

Riverside County

Sacramento County

San Bernardino County

San Diego County

San Francisco County

Santa Barbara County

Tulare County

Tuolumne County

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McDermott Will & Emery LLP

Dakessian Law, Ltd.

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/23/2022 01:01:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/23/2022 01:01:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PAYMENT FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047559 IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF# 31155431 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

PAYMENT FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047559 IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF# 31155431 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KAYE, KATHLEEN FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13054214 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12882230.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KAYE, KATHLEEN FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13054214 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12882230.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/25/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/25/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13054785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12882801.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13054785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12882801.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 05/18/2022

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 05/18/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/19/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/19/2022

DOCUMENT - OTHER (CLERK'S APPLICATION AND ORDER RE: CORRECTION OF ERROR) FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/10/2022

DOCUMENT - OTHER (CLERK'S APPLICATION AND ORDER RE: CORRECTION OF ERROR) FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/10/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/11/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/11/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL LLC FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047559 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12875575.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL LLC FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047559 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12875575.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LEGAL SUPPORT SERVICES, INC. FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047656 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12875672.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LEGAL SUPPORT SERVICES, INC. FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047656 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12875672.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/10/2022 03:09:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/10/2022 03:09:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/04/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/04/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/04/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/04/2022

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31161084 RECEIVED ON 05/25/2022 10:43:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13054785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12882801.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY KAYE, KATHLEEN FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13054214 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12882230.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047559 IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF# 31155431 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO RANDALL SHERMAN EFFECTIVE 05/18/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketRELATED CASES INCLUDE: 30-2022-01258057-CU-MC-CJC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE RANDALL J. SHERMAN FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/23/2022 01:01:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE GLENDA SANDERS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/10/2022 03:09:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT - OTHER (CLERK'S APPLICATION AND ORDER RE: CORRECTION OF ERROR) FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31152933 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2022 05:23:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044811 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872827.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 05/04/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greater Fresno Area Chamber of Commerce is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Imperial County is a litigant

Latest cases where Madera County is a litigant