This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/04/2018 at 19:51:09 (UTC).

SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTER VS. JOSE RUBEN PINION FUERTE

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSE RUBEN PINION FUERTE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTE

Defendant

JOSE RUBEN PINION FUERTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • NOTICE - OTHER (VOIDED FILING AFTER DENIAL OF REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/24/2017; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT VOIDED ON 07/24/2017.; Filing Party: 'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT VOIDED ON 07/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTER REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED IN WHOLE ON 06/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/27/2017; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4742252 RECEIVED ON 06/26/2017 03:16:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTER ON 06/26/2017; Filing Party: SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTER ON 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED BY SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTER ON 06/26/2017; Filing Party: SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTER ON 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 06/26/2017.; Filing Party: COU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTER ON 06/26/2017; Filing Party: SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE CENTER ON 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC is a litigant