This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 05:55:10 (UTC).

SOUHELA RODRIGUEZ VS. BKCO INC.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 SOUHELA RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BKCO INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Souhela Rodriguez

Defendants

Fred Sed Incorporated

BKT Irvine, Inc.

Farzad Sedighravesh

BKCO Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Akopyan Law Firm, APC

Defendant Attorney

Jackson Lewis P.C. - Los Angeles

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 06/01/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 06/01/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31010155 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31010155 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY TURBOCOURT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12856225 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12683904.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY TURBOCOURT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12856225 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12683904.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 03/01/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 03/01/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 03/01/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 03/01/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/08/2021 03:11:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/08/2021 03:11:00 PM.

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 03/04/2021

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 03/04/2021

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 03/04/2021

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 03/04/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12850880 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12678559.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12850880 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12678559.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY SEDIGHRAVESH, FARZAD ON 03/02/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY SEDIGHRAVESH, FARZAD ON 03/02/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SEDIGHRAVESH, FARZAD ON 03/01/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SEDIGHRAVESH, FARZAD ON 03/01/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/26/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/26/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12794482 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12621459

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12794482 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12621459.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SEDIGHRAVESH, FARZAD; BKCO INC.; BKT IRVINE, INC.; FRED SED INCORPORATED ON 10/09/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SEDIGHRAVESH, FARZAD; BKCO INC.; BKT IRVINE, INC.; FRED SED INCORPORATED ON 10/09/2020

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/18/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/18/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/21/2020 11:47:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/21/2020 11:47:00 AM.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31021837 RECEIVED ON 06/01/2021 12:35:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 06/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31010155 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY TURBOCOURT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12856225 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12683904.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1817615 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2021 05:40:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/08/2021 03:11:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/07/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-42.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE MARTHA K. GOODING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO DAVID HOFFER EFFECTIVE 08/21/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. MARTHA GOODING) FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 08/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3928375 RECEIVED ON 08/14/2020 02:31:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY TURBOCOURT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12766122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12592621.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1757898 RECEIVED ON 08/06/2020 04:27:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 08/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 08/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 08/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, SOUHELA ON 08/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIA Technologies, Inc. (a Taiwan corporation) is a litigant