This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:23 (UTC).

SOTO - NAME CHANGE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 SOTO - NAME CHANGE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIANNY SOTO

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 06/16/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 06/16/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING OF NON-PETITIONING PARENT FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 09/16/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING OF NON-PETITIONING PARENT FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 09/16/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF HEARING TO NON-PETITIONING PARENT FOR PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 09/16/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF HEARING TO NON-PETITIONING PARENT FOR PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 09/16/2016

DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 12/29/2016

DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 12/29/2016

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 08/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 08/15/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 11/03/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 11/03/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/16/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/16/2016 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 05/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 05/04/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 08/25/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 08/25/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 12/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 12/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 12/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 12/23/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 08/25/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 08/25/2016

REJECT NOTICE

REJECT NOTICE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 12/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 12/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 12/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REJECT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 11/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 11/03/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME CONTINUED TO 12/29/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME SCHEDULED FOR 12/29/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN D100 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OF NON-PETITIONING PARENT FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 09/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 05/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SOTO, KIANNY REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN D100 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY SOTO, KIANNY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.