This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/04/2020 at 06:59:42 (UTC).

SOPHIA WODYNSKI VS. ROBERT C. RICHEY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 SOPHIA WODYNSKI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERT C RICHEY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

Michelle Wodynski

Sophia Wodynski

Defendants

Homeaway Holdings, Inc.

Homeaway, Inc.

BB Mammoth Properties LP

Robert C. Richey

Charles Cockey

RCR PLUMBING AND MECHANICAL INC. VRBO

RCR Plumbing and Mechanical Inc. VRBO Holdings Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Boesch Law Group

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 11/22/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 11/22/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 11/22/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 11/22/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12665983 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12490663.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12665983 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12490663.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 11/22/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 11/22/2019.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2864627 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2864627 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1694553 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1694553 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2869252 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2869252 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2869662 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2869662 REJECTED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 12/12/2019

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 12/12/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 12/12/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 12/12/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: C19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41044736 RECEIVED ON 12/12/2019 03:34:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketWODYNSKI, MICHELLE APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM CR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2869662 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2869252 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1694553 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2864627 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12665983 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12490663.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1691780 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2019 06:41:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 11/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WODYNSKI, SOPHIA; WODYNSKI, MICHELLE ON 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RCR PLUMBING is a litigant

Latest cases where HOMEAWAY.COM INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant