This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/07/2020 at 18:19:26 (UTC).

SOPHIA LI VS. DREAM DINING CALIFORNIA L L C

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 SOPHIA LI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DREAM DINING CALIFORNIA L L C. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOPHIA LI

Defendants and Others

DREAM DINING CALIFORNIA L L C

TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC

Cross Defendant

WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF CHEN & TRAN

Defendant and Other Attorney

MCCARTHY & BEAVERS

Cross Defendant Attorney

TYSON & MENDES LLP

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4813591 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4813591 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/17/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/17/2018 01:30:00 PM.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY, INC. ON 10/17/2017

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY, INC. ON 10/17/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) FILED BY WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY, INC. ON 10/11/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) FILED BY WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY, INC. ON 10/11/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/04/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/04/2017 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 08/28/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 08/28/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2575049 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2575049 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 06/22/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 06/22/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12133071 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11956874.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12133071 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11956874.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 03/30/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 03/30/2017

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 03/30/2017

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 03/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 03/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 03/09/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 02/21/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 02/21/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 02/21/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 02/21/2017

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 02/21/2017

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 02/21/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 01/04/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 01/04/2017

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1482637 RECEIVED ON 03/27/2018 09:37:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY, INC. ON 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2654681 RECEIVED ON 03/27/2018 04:20:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY TORIDOLL DINING CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1468976 RECEIVED ON 02/14/2018 11:55:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4813591 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 02/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 02/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 02/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2532513 RECEIVED ON 02/21/2017 06:29:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 01/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2520438 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2017 10:12:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12085944 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11909912.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 01/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LI, SOPHIA ON 01/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3495863 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2017 05:44:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHOLESOME MELROSE BAKERY INC. is a litigant