This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:45:55 (UTC).

SOON JA HONG VS. CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 SOON JA HONG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOON JA HONG

Defendants

CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC.

HA YOUNG KIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF BRIAN W. TOPPILA

Defendant Attorney

LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC. ON 06/23/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC. ON 06/23/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/24/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/24/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12058305 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11882270.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12058305 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11882270.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2534591 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2534591 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 03/16/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 03/16/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/22/2016 03:20:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/22/2016 03:20:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/01/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/01/2017 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12113682 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11937525.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12113682 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11937525.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HONG, SOON JA ON 06/08/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HONG, SOON JA ON 06/08/2016

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC. ON 02/27/2017

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC. ON 02/27/2017

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC. ON 01/04/2017

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC. ON 01/04/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (CONTINUE TRIAL AND MOTION) FILED BY CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC. ON 12/22/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (CONTINUE TRIAL AND MOTION) FILED BY CALIFORNIA LIVING, INC. ON 12/22/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12113951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11937794.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12113951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11937794.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12082597 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11906565.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12082597 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11906565.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927557 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751782.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927557 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751782.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY HONG, SOON JA ON 05/25/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY HONG, SOON JA ON 05/25/2017

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HONG, SOON JA ON 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4793857 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017 10:12:23 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 09/29/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 12/08/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2506994 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/13/2017 01:53:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2472945 RECEIVED ON 06/23/2016 02:30:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HONG, SOON JA ON 06/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3422755 RECEIVED ON 06/08/2016 06:03:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927557 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751782.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HONG, SOON JA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HONG, SOON JA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY HONG, SOON JA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385177 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:38:46 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.