This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:20:18 (UTC).

SONIA CRUZ VS. PEGGY ANN ROSS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 SONIA CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEGGY ANN ROSS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SONIA CRUZ

Defendant

PEGGY ANN ROSS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF AMEER A. SHAH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

COMPLAINT FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 08/12/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/14/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/14/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 12/31/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 12/31/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 08/12/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 12/31/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2299081 RECEIVED ON 12/31/2013 10:03:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/14/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CRUZ, SONIA ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348494 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 05:54:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less