This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 07:49:34 (UTC).

SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC. VS. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dariush Solaimani

Solaimani Enterprises, Inc.

Defendants

Caliber Motors Inc.

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Consumer Legal Services, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC.; SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH ON 01/18/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC.; SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH ON 01/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC.; SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH ON 01/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC.; SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH ON 01/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC.; SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH ON 01/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC.; SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH ON 01/18/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995547 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823466.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995547 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823466.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH; SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 01/24/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH; SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 01/24/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH; SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 01/24/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH; SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 01/24/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH; SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41289532 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2022 04:02:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH; SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1943089 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2022 01:49:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 01/18/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995547 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823466.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC.; SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH ON 01/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC.; SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH ON 01/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SOLAIMANI ENTERPRISES, INC.; SOLAIMANI, DARIUSH ON 01/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31108526 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2022 12:01:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIBER MOTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA MERCEDES-BENZ OF ANAHEIM is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant