This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/23/2022 at 04:41:07 (UTC).

SOKUNTHY YORK VS. TRANS UNION, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 SOKUNTHY YORK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRANS UNION, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sokunthy York

Defendants

Equifax Inc

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Law Office of Whitney D. Ackerman, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 06/29/2022.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 06/29/2022.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 06/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 06/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 06/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 06/29/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31175417 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31175417 REJECTED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 07/06/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 07/06/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/01/2022

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/01/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31177061 RECEIVED ON 07/06/2022 08:56:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 07/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31175417 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketYORK, SOKUNTHY REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 07/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41352902 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2022 12:35:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY YORK, SOKUNTHY ON 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 06/29/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUIFAX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant