This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 04:00:53 (UTC).

SOHA ESSAYLI VS. WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 SOHA ESSAYLI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Soha Essayli

Defendant

Windstone Health Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawyers for Justice, PC

Defendant Attorney

Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/29/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/29/2020

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/27/2020

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/27/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/21/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/21/2020

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/21/2020 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/21/2020 08:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 09/15/2020

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 09/15/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12735832 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12562111.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12735832 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12562111.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 05/26/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 05/26/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/20/2020 12:43:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/20/2020 12:43:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 04/01/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 04/01/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 04/01/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 04/01/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2020-03-11 11:55:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2020-03-11 11:55:00.0.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 02/20/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 02/20/2020.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41128231 RECEIVED ON 10/29/2020 01:50:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2951124 RECEIVED ON 10/21/2020 02:43:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 10/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2020-03-11 11:55:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/28/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketTHE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/28/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12713104 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12538483.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2893706 RECEIVED ON 02/20/2020 11:15:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 02/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ESSAYLI, SOHA ON 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Windstone Health Services, Inc. is a litigant