This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/18/2018 at 08:33:16 (UTC).

SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC VS. JAMES ALLEN HOPPE

Case Summary

On 08/19/2016 SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES ALLEN HOPPE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants

JAMES ALLEN HOPPE JR

SYDNEY HOPPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STIRLING J. HOPSON

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12028429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11852434.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12028429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11852434.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 9/13/16) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 9/13/16) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/08/16) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/08/16) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/08/16) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/08/16) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12017423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11841490.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12017423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11841490.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/19/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/19/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/19/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/19/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/19/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/19/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12028429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11852434.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 9/13/16) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4603187 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016 04:33:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/08/16) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 09/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/08/16) RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4602683 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016 10:03:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12017423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11841490.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SOCAL PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4593610 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2016 06:12:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less