This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 11:04:42 (UTC).

SMITH V SMITH

Case Summary

On 07/29/2013 SMITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7004

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles M. Smith

Petitioner

SMITH, CHARLES M

Defendant

Lorraine M. Smith

Respondent

SMITH, LORRAINE M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2014
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 04/14/2014 11:02:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 04/11/2014 11:23:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • JUDGMENT 04/11/2014 11:21:00 # Pages:6; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER 04/11/2014 08:15:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • JUDGMENT - DEFAULT 04/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • HRG - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 04/01/2014 09:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 03/19/2014 08:50:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/14/2014 12:23:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2013
  • SUMMONS 11/25/2013 13:49:00 AMENDED # Pages:2; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/12/2013 15:54:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/12/2013 15:54:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 11/12/2013 11:15:00 VACATED PER ORDER DATED 2/20/14 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 10/03/2013 12:19:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 07/29/2013 11:24:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • SUMMONS 07/29/2013 11:24:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 07/29/2013 11:23:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 07/29/2013 09:24:00 GRANTED # Pages:2; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 07/29/2013 14:21:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: SMITH, CHARLES M

    Read MoreRead Less