This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 06:05:48 (UTC).

SMITH-TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SMITH-TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROOKS GORDON

Respondents

STEVEN C FRENCH

ROGER W FRENCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM, PC

Respondent Attorneys

HART KING A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

MURTAUGH TREGLIA STERN & DEILY LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2762606 RECEIVED ON 02/13/2019 03:11:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GORDON, BROOKS ON 02/13/2019; Filing Party: GORDON, BROOKS ON 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED BY GORDON, BROOKS ON 02/13/2019; Filing Party: GORDON, BROOKS ON 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2749009 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1577493 RECEIVED ON 01/07/2019 03:45:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORDON, BROOKS ON 01/07/2019; Filing Party: GORDON, BROOKS ON 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • PETITION (SUBSEQUENT) HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION - OTHER 01/07/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PETITION (SUBSEQUENT)(PETITION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT) FILED BY BROOKS GORDON IS APPROVED AS SUPPLEMENTED.; Filing Party: BROOKS GORDON IS APPROVED AS SUPPLEMENTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2018
  • (P) TRUST PETITION CONTINUED TO 04/19/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 198 - OPPOSITION TO PETITION IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12293223 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12116991.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3632735 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2018 10:46:42 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • RESPONSE FILED BY FRENCH, STEVEN C. ON 02/02/2018; Filing Party: FRENCH, STEVEN C. ON 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3596257 RECEIVED ON 10/11/2017 12:46:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY GORDON, BROOKS ON 10/11/2017; Filing Party: GORDON, BROOKS ON 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • (P) TRUST PETITION SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 199 - INTERNAL AFFAIRS IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233847 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057529.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600965 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 12:50:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • TRUST PETITION FILED BY GORDON, BROOKS ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GORDON, BROOKS ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.