This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 14:47:07 (UTC).

SMITH- ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 SMITH- ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT was filed as a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES

Respondent

JUSTIN SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Respondent Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: STATUS REVIEW (MH); Department: C09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS REVIEW (MH) 07/20/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSTATUS REVIEW (MH) CONTINUED TO 08/10/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSTATUS REVIEW (MH) SCHEDULED FOR 08/10/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSTATUS REVIEW (MH) SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT SETS A STATUS REVIEW (MH) FOR 07/20/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C9.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 06/29/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY BEHAVIORAL HEALTH IS GRANTED.; Filing Party: BEHAVIORAL HEALTH IS GRANTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/29/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 06/22/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPLAN FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/17/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21019127 RECEIVED ON 05/17/2021 08:26:10 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/17/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER APPOINTING THE ORANGE COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER, ETC.) FILED BY SMITH, JUSTIN ON 05/11/2021; Filing Party: SMITH, JUSTIN ON 05/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/11/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/18/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41191919 RECEIVED ON 05/11/2021 07:07:40 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/11/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/11/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 05/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less