This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/18/2019 at 03:56:53 (UTC).

SINGH VS. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2015 SINGH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BALDEV K. SINGH

BALJIT SINGH

Defendants

MORGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC.

DEUTSCHE BANK

THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE

NATIONSTAR MOTGAGE

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR HARBORVIEW MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-4

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

U.S. BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MCGUIREWOODS LLP

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4516212 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4516212 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/22/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT REJECTED ON 03/17/2016.

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4516212 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2452847 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016 10:13:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K.; SINGH, BALJIT ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2015
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/2015 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/2015 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 560.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11799244 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11623552.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K. ON 06/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K. ON 06/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11799180 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11623488.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K. ON 06/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 06/11/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K. ON 06/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SINGH, BALDEV K. ON 06/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DEUTSCHE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant