This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/27/2023 at 03:46:01 (UTC).

SIMON ESCATEL ROBLEDO VS. GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 SIMON ESCATEL ROBLEDO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Simon Escatel Robledo

Defendant

General Motors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MFS Legal, Inc.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/12/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/12/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/12/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/12/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/12/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/12/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164378 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992475.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164378 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992475.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2023 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2023 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164378 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF# 31255620 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

PAYMENT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164378 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF# 31255620 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/27/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/27/2023

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

COMPLAINT VOIDED ON 03/22/2023.

COMPLAINT VOIDED ON 03/22/2023.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT VOIDED ON 03/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21265081 RECEIVED ON 01/27/2023 03:32:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164378 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF# 31255620 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2023 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164378 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992475.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31255620 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2023 12:42:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HESSELTINE, DAVID ON 01/12/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROBLEDO, SIMON ESCATEL ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less