Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/19/2020 at 14:46:34 (UTC).

SIMMONS- MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 SIMMONS- MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CANAAN SIMMONS

Minor

JAXTON SIMMONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DANIEL M HODES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • HearingDescription: (P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR; Department: C17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR REASSIGNED TO C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 05/27/2020 AT 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR SCHEDULED FOR 05/27/2020 AT 10:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR CONTINUED TO 05/27/2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/28/2020 04:43:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3897803 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2020 02:45:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY SIMMONS, CANAAN ON 03/10/2020; Filing Party: SIMMONS, CANAAN ON 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docket(P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 201 - FIRST PAPERS-OTHER PROBATE: PETITION COMMENCING OTHER PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE PROBATE CODE AND OBJECTIONS OR OTHER OPPOSITION TO SUCH PETITIONS, 68 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS-PROBATE: MOTION, APPLICATIO IN THE AMOUNT OF 525.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12723002 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12548941.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41074389 RECEIVED ON 03/06/2020 07:44:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF CLAIM FILED BY SIMMONS, CANAAN ON 03/06/2020; Filing Party: SIMMONS, CANAAN ON 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HODES DANIEL M