This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/27/2020 at 06:49:35 (UTC).

SIMA OSTRICK VS. LISA WILLIS

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 SIMA OSTRICK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LISA WILLIS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sima Ostrick

Marc Ostrick

Defendants

Jim Ardery

Laguna Beach Properties

Lisa Willis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert J. Stroj

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY OSTRICK, SIMA; OSTRICK, MARC ON 07/15/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY OSTRICK, SIMA; OSTRICK, MARC ON 07/15/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OSTRICK, SIMA; OSTRICK, MARC ON 07/15/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OSTRICK, SIMA; OSTRICK, MARC ON 07/15/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12759275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12585668.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12759275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12585668.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 07/15/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 07/15/2020.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3925861 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3925861 REJECTED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OSTRICK, MARC; OSTRICK, SIMA ON 08/24/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OSTRICK, MARC; OSTRICK, SIMA ON 08/24/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2933680 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2020 09:23:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OSTRICK, MARC; OSTRICK, SIMA ON 08/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3925861 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12759275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12585668.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41097932 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2020 09:49:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 07/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OSTRICK, SIMA; OSTRICK, MARC ON 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY OSTRICK, SIMA; OSTRICK, MARC ON 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROJ, ROBERT J